EP2002734 - CARBOHYDRATE COMPOSITION OBTAINABLE FROM MEDITERRANEAN FRUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/51] | Carbohydrate composition obtainable from mediterranean fruits | ||
[2016/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wild Valencia, S.A. Partida la Coma s/n 46740 Carcaixent Valencia / ES | [2008/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wild, Hans-Peter Rudolf-Wild-Str. 107-115 69214 Eppelheim / DE | 02 /
Salom, Rafael C/ Virgen de Oreto, 18 46250 L'Alcudia / ES | 03 /
Zaldua, Ignacio C/ Almirante, 10-1° 46003 Valencia / ES | [2009/28] |
Former [2008/51] | 01 /
Wild, Hans-Peter Rudolf-Wild-Str. 107-115 69214 Eppelheim / DE | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/40] |
Former [2008/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07011615.7 | 13.06.2007 | [2008/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2002734 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2002734 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A23L29/30, A23L27/30, A23L2/02, A23L2/60, A23C9/13, A61P3/10, A61P3/06, A61P9/02, C13B50/00, C13B10/00, A61K31/70 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
A23C9/1307 (EP,US);
A23C9/13 (US);
A23L2/02 (EP,US);
A23L2/38 (EP,US);
A23L2/60 (EP,US);
A23L27/33 (EP,US);
A23L29/30 (EP,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A23L33/125 (EP,US);
A23L5/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
C13B10/00 (EP,US);
C13B50/00 (EP,US);
C13K1/00 (US);
C13K11/00 (US);
C13K13/00 (US);
A23L21/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/51] | A23L1/09, A23L1/236, A23L2/02, A23L2/60, C13D1/00, C13F3/00, A23L1/30, A61P3/10, A61P3/06, A61P9/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/40] |
Former [2008/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 13.06.2007 | BA | 13.06.2007 | HR | 13.06.2007 | MK | 13.06.2007 | RS | 13.06.2007 | Title | German: | AUS MEDITERRANEN FRÜCHTEN GEWINNBARE KOHLEHYDRATZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2016/20] | English: | CARBOHYDRATE COMPOSITION OBTAINABLE FROM MEDITERRANEAN FRUITS | [2016/20] | French: | COMPOSITION DE GLUCIDE OBTENUE À PARTIR DE FRUITS MÉDITERRANÉENS | [2016/20] |
Former [2008/51] | Aus Meeresfrüchten gewinnbare Kohlenhydratzusammensetzung | ||
Former [2008/51] | Carbohydrate composition obtainable from mediterranean fruits | ||
Former [2008/51] | Composition de glucide obtenue à partir de fruits méditerranéens | Examination procedure | 16.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 05.10.2016 | LT | 05.10.2016 | LV | 05.10.2016 | MC | 05.10.2016 | IS | 05.02.2017 | LU | 13.06.2017 | [2021/31] |
Former [2018/21] | EE | 05.10.2016 | |
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
LU | 13.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | EE | 05.10.2016 | |
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/42] | EE | 05.10.2016 | |
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/26] | LT | 05.10.2016 | |
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 05.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB716934 (UNIPEKTIN A G) [X] 1-11,31,32 * examples 1,2; claims 1,8 *; | [X]FR2157819 (MILES LAB) [X] 1-11,31,32 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 5; examples 1,2; claims 1,8,9 *; | [X]US4296141 (DE PAOLIS POTITO U) [X] 1-11,31,32 * column 3, paragraphs 1-29; examples 1,2; claims 1-3 *; | [X]WO8801835 (WILDMAN JOHN MAXWELL [AU]) [X] 1-11,31,32 * claim 9 *; | [X]EP0440586 (SANDOZ NUTRITION LTD [CH]) [X] 1-11,13-32,34 * page 2, lines 21-35,47-49,56 - page 3, lines 1,25-55; example 1; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0587972 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-12,31,32 * example 1; claims 1,6,7 * * page 2, lines 36-42 * * page 3, lines 9-15 * * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 8 *; | [X]EP0617133 (COMPANIA GENERAL DEL ALGARROBO [ES]) [X] 1-11,31,32 * claims 1,2 *; | [XA]EP0765609 (ECKES GRANINI GMBH CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-11,13-32 * examples 9,12,14; claim 1 * * page 3, line 56 * [A] 12; | [DX]US5624500 (SANJUAN DIAZ CARLOS [ES]) [DX] 1-11,31,32; | [X]DE19619844 (DAVDUV GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-11,31,32 * column 3, lines 40-67; claim 1 *; | [A]WO0060128 (AECI LTD [ZA], et al) [A] 18 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO02078458 (VIVALAC INC [US]) [X] 1-11,31-34 * examples 1-4,6; claims 1,5,18-20 * * page 8, lines 20-24 * * page 9, lines 21-25 * * page 13, lines 15-30 *; | [DA]US6709527 (FECHTER WOLFGANG L [ZA], et al)[DA] 18; | [A]WO2007062087 (NEWAYCEUTICAL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 15; examples 1-3; claims 1,8,12,13,17-19 * |