Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1892508
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.11.2013 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
01.10.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.07.2013 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.02.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.12.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.11.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.08.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.06.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.01.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.08.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.01.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.10.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] |
26.09.2008 |
First examination report |
|
23.09.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.09.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] |
25.01.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |