Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7920259 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2011 | B2 | US2008239313 | 02.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006039425 | 23.08.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1892508 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006039425 | 23.08.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006039425 | 10.03.2011 | B4 | DE102006039425 | 28.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006039425 | 23.08.2006 |