EP1990102 - Dispensing device, cleaning device and method of cleaning a dispensing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stibbe Management B.V. Brink 27 1251 KS Laren / NL | [2008/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mink, Johannes Hendrikus Herenweg 286 2211VE Noordwijkerhout / NL | 02 /
Meeuwisse, Renatus Petrus Cornelis Ijsvogellaan 41 2261DL Leidschendam / NL | 03 /
Langeveld, Michiel Jacobus Johannes Maasstroom 28 2721BB Zoetermeer / NL | [2008/46] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Davide Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Petraz, Davide Luigi GLP Srl Piazzale Cavedalis, 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | ||
Former [2008/46] | Vermeulen, Martijn Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 07075356.1 | 07.05.2007 | [2008/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1990102 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B08B1/04, A46B13/00, B05B15/02 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
A45D34/00 (EP);
A46B13/003 (EP);
B01F33/841 (EP);
B08B1/34 (EP);
B08B9/00 (EP);
A45D2200/058 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/46] | Title | German: | Abgabevorrichtung, Reinigungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zum Reinigen einer Abgabevorrichtung | [2008/46] | English: | Dispensing device, cleaning device and method of cleaning a dispensing device | [2008/46] | French: | Dispositif de distribution, dispositif de nettoyage et procédé de nettoyage d'un dispositif de distribution | [2008/46] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 22.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/04] | 17.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2009 | 31.05.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2010 | 31.05.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2962745 (NEDLAND PEDERSEN OLAF); | [DYA]US5647411 (KOPPE KLAUS-DIETER [DE], et al); | [XA]US5903951 (IONTA RICHARD [US], et al); | [XY]US2003230634 (HEIDE JIRKO [DE], et al); | [DA]WO2005082510 (LENTEQ LP [US], et al) |