EP1834903 - Handling apparatus for carrying vehicular tires to and from a storage shelf or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korpela, Juha Rengonkuja 8 04430 Järvenpää / FI | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | LEITZINGER OY Tammasaarenkatu 1 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2007/38] | Application number, filing date | 07103691.7 | 07.03.2007 | [2007/38] | Priority number, date | FI20060005166 | 15.03.2006 Original published format: FI 20065166 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1834903 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1834903 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
B65G1/04 (EP);
B60B30/00 (FI);
B65G1/0407 (FI);
B66F9/14 (FI);
B66F9/18 (FI);
B66F9/19 (FI);
B65G2201/0273 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/21] |
Former [2007/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Transportvorrichtung zum Transportieren von Fahrzeugreifen zu und von Lagergestellen und dergleichen | [2007/38] | English: | Handling apparatus for carrying vehicular tires to and from a storage shelf or the like | [2007/38] | French: | Appareil de manipulation pour transporter des pneus de véhicule vers et depuis d'une étagère de stockage ou similaire | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/37] | 29.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPS62222902 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [YA]JPH061407 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO); | [A]JP2002068408 (HIRATA SPINNING); | [XY]DE10247552 (WEBER ANDREAS [DE]) |