Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] |
30.04.2010 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.04.2010 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.04.2010 | Definitive list of designations | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
21.08.2009 | Publication of search report | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] |
07.04.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.08.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] |