Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] |
08.05.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.04.2009 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
24.04.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
22.08.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |