EP1975553 - System for measurement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. Affolternstrasse 52 8050 Zürich / CH | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saarinen, Kari Skogsvägen 10 A 722 17, VÄSTERAS / SE | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik, et al BRANN AB Västgötagatan 2 P.O. Box 17192 104 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07105117.1 | 28.03.2007 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1975553 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/06 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
G01B11/0691 (EP);
D21G9/0009 (EP);
G01B2210/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/24] |
Former [2008/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Messsystem | [2008/40] | English: | System for measurement | [2008/40] | French: | Système de mesure | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/40] | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0037885 (HONEYWELL MEASUREX CORP [US]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 10 * * page 6, lines 1-4 ** page 9, lines 1-31 *; | [X]WO03031904 (ABB INC [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 18, line 11 - page 19, line 20; figures 6a,6b,7a,7b * |