Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] |
07.12.2012 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.08.2012 | Change - applicant | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
29.05.2012 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.04.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.04.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.12.2009 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
12.08.2009 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
29.04.2009 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
29.04.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.04.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] |
14.11.2008 | First examination report | |
12.11.2008 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
15.08.2008 | Publication of search report | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
15.08.2008 | Change - classification | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
19.10.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |
19.10.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |