Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7797485 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2010 | B2 | US2007271436 | 22.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20060044657 | 18.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100883651B | Global Dossier | 18.02.2009 | B1 | KR20070111626 | 22.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20060044657 | 18.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007310878 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20060044657 | 18.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1858018 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2008 | A3 | EP1858018 | 21.11.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20060044657 | 18.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101075212 | 21.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20060044657 | 18.05.2006 |