EP1858018 - Method and apparatus for allocating disc space [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Seoul 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRNASOV, Alexander, 816-1004 Byeokjeokgol 8-danji Apt. Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
HWANG, Joo-young, 605-1002 Shinnamushil 6-danji Apt. Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07107254.0 | 30.04.2007 | [2007/47] | Priority number, date | KR20060044657 | 18.05.2006 Original published format: KR 20060044657 | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1858018 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1858018 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/034, G11B27/32, G06F3/06, G11B20/12, G06F12/02 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G06F9/06 (KR);
G06F12/0223 (EP,US);
G06F9/00 (KR);
G11B20/10 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10916 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1294 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/47] | G11B27/034, G11B27/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/21] |
Former [2007/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zuweisen von Speicherplatz | [2007/47] | English: | Method and apparatus for allocating disc space | [2007/47] | French: | Procédé et appareil d'allocation d'espace de disque | [2007/47] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 18.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/17] | 07.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0806003 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-32 * paragraphs [0027] - [0040] * * paragraph [0008]; figure 5 *; | [X]US2001012446 (KIZU TOSHIKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0057] , [0058] , [0076] , [0077] , [0109] - [0111] *; | [X]US6745311 (FABRIZIO DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005019002 (OKABE KENICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-32 * paragraphs [0002] , [0011] , [0038] , [0042] - [0047] *; | [A]US2005188151 (LEE JAE-SUNG [KR]) [A] 1-32 * abstract * * paragraph [0040] *; | [PA]US2006288156 (FISH WILSON M [US], et al) [PA] 1-32* paragraphs [0006] - [0009] - [0027] , [0028] * |