EP1865419 - Automated selection and inclusion of a message signature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states RESEARCH IN MOTION LIMITED 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adams, Neil 550 Little Dover Crescent Waterloo Ontario N2K 4E4 / CA | 02 /
MacFarlane, David Victor 518 Beaverwood Street Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2M2 / CA | 03 /
Little, Herb 504 Old Oak Place Waterloo Ontario N2T 2V8 / CA | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2008/44] | Rickard, David John Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2007/50] | Rickard, David John 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 07117154.0 | 21.06.2005 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1865419 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1865419 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/22, H04L12/58 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
G06Q10/107 (EP,US);
H04L51/212 (US);
H04L51/066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Extension states | YU | 25.09.2007 | Title | German: | Automatische Auswahl und Inkludierung einer Nachrichtensignatur | [2007/50] | English: | Automated selection and inclusion of a message signature | [2007/50] | French: | Sélection automatisée et inclusion d'une signature de message | [2007/50] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 03.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05105515.0 / EP1736896 | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.2010 | BE | 29.12.2010 | CY | 29.12.2010 | CZ | 29.12.2010 | DK | 29.12.2010 | EE | 29.12.2010 | FI | 29.12.2010 | HU | 29.12.2010 | IT | 29.12.2010 | LT | 29.12.2010 | NL | 29.12.2010 | PL | 29.12.2010 | RO | 29.12.2010 | SE | 29.12.2010 | SI | 29.12.2010 | SK | 29.12.2010 | TR | 29.12.2010 | BG | 29.03.2011 | GR | 30.03.2011 | ES | 09.04.2011 | IS | 29.04.2011 | PT | 29.04.2011 | IE | 21.06.2011 | LU | 21.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
TR | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
IE | 21.06.2011 | ||
LU | 21.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
IE | 21.06.2011 | ||
LU | 21.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
IE | 21.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
IE | 21.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
IE | 21.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
DK | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
NL | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
BE | 29.12.2010 | ||
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 29.12.2010 | |
CY | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
SE | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/20] | LT | 29.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6510453 (APFEL DARREN [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 2, line 3 - column 4, line 19 * * column 11, line 17 - column 12, line 21 * * column 14, line 28 - column 16, line 19 * * figures 4,7 *; | [A]US2004205330 (GODFREY JAMES A [CA], et al) [A] 1-21* paragraphs [0055] , [0056] *; | [E]EP1736896 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [E] 1-21 * the whole document * |