25.03.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
22.05.2015 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] |
24.04.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
14.04.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.04.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.04.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.02.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.01.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
23.01.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
03.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.05.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.03.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.10.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.09.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.08.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.07.2011 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
01.04.2011 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] |
29.03.2011 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.03.2011 |
First examination report |
|
09.03.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.02.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] |
30.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.07.2010 |
Publication of search report |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
01.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
29.02.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] |