EP1906288 - Dynamic messages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baier, John J. 9072 Wren Court Mentor, OH 44060 / US | 02 /
Dorgelo, Eric G. 13-65 Foxwood Drive Port Moody British Columbia V3H 4Z5 / CA | 03 /
Johnson, David K. 720 Michigan Avenue Waukesha, WI 53188-3005 / US | 04 /
Bezdicek, Jan Skroupova 749 53501 Prelouc / CZ | 05 /
Sapach, Dale Robert 3588 Beach Avenue Roberts Creek British Columbia V0N 2W2 / CA | 06 /
Hall, Kenwood H. 1768 E. Sapphire Dr. Hudson, OH 44236 / US | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/21] |
Former [2008/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/14] | Englaender, Klaus HML Patent and Trademark Attorneys Schraudolphstrasse 3 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07117476.7 | 28.09.2007 | [2008/14] | Priority number, date | US20060537239 | 29.09.2006 Original published format: US 537239 | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1906288 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1906288 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | [2010/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1906288 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418, G08B25/01 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
G05B19/4184 (EP,US);
G08B25/012 (EP,US);
G05B2219/23097 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31365 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31438 (EP,US);
G05B2219/33149 (EP,US);
G05B2219/33306 (EP,US);
G05B2219/34038 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36137 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/14] | G05B19/418 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/21] |
Former [2011/18] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dynamische Nachrichten | [2008/14] | English: | Dynamic messages | [2008/14] | French: | Messages dynamiques | [2008/14] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 26.02.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15168277.0 / EP2940544 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9836335 (FISHER ROSEMOUNT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,13,20 * page 67, line 27 - page 83, line 27 * [I] 2-4; | [XI]US2006168013 (WILSON IRVINE W [DE], et al) [X] 1,13,20 * abstract * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] *[I] 2-4 | by applicant | WO9836335 | US2006168013 |