04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
14.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
17.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
01.03.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] |
02.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
13.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
06.07.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] |
25.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] |
11.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
04.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
21.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
23.03.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |
17.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] |
10.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
27.01.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] |
20.01.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
29.07.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] |
22.06.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.06.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.01.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.11.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] |
14.05.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] |
15.01.2010 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] |
08.01.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.11.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.11.2009 |
First examination report |
|
16.10.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] |
08.10.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.10.2009 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] |
08.05.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] |