Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9699134 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2017 | B2 | US2016234156 | 11.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213665405 | 31.10.2012 | US27325208 | 18.11.2008 | US201615132512 | 19.04.2016 | EP07122406 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9356794 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2016 | B2 | US2013060957 | 07.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213665405 | 31.10.2012 | US27325208 | 18.11.2008 | EP07122406 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2892213 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2020 | B1 | EP2892213 | 08.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15152579 | 05.12.2007 | EP10192589 | 05.12.2007 | EP07122406 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2375701 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2015 | B1 | EP2375701 | 12.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10192589 | 05.12.2007 | EP07122406 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104378372B | 17.05.2019 | B | CN104378372 | 25.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200810190812 | 05.12.2008 | EP07122406 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105162899 | 16.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200810190812 | 05.12.2008 | EP07122406 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8305929 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2012 | B2 | US2009147782 | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07122406 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2136535 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2011 | B1 | EP2136535 | 23.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07122406 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2068533 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2011 | B1 | EP2068533 | 10.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07122406 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE514277T | 15.07.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07122406 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE523029T | 15.09.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07122406 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101459670 | 17.06.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07122406 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Divisional application | EP2136535 | EP2375701 | EP2892213 |