EP2068533 - Electronic device for communication within a network and method for operating an electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mank, Armin@c/o Stuttgart Technology Center Sony Deutschland GmbH Hedelfinger Str. 61 70327, Stuttgart / DE | [2011/35] |
Former [2009/24] | 01 /
Mank, Armin c/o Stuttgart Technology Center Sony Deutschland GmbH Hedelfinger Str. 61 70327, Stuttgart / DE | Representative(s) | Keck, Stephan, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Phoenixbau Königstraße 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Keck, Stephan, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Königstraße 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/24] | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07122406.7 | 05.12.2007 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2068533 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2068533 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/12, // H04L29/06, H04L12/28 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
H04L61/106 (EP,CN,US);
H04L12/2805 (EP,CN,US);
H04L12/2836 (EP,CN,US);
H04L69/18 (EP,CN,US);
H04L61/5092 (US);
H04L69/14 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/24] | Title | German: | Elektronische Vorrichtung zur Kommunikation in einem Netz und Betriebsverfahren für eine elektronische Vorrichtung | [2009/24] | English: | Electronic device for communication within a network and method for operating an electronic device | [2009/24] | French: | Dispositif électronique pour une communication au sein d'un réseau et procédé de fonctionnement d'un disposition électronique | [2009/24] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 17.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09171476.6 / EP2136535 | EP10192589.9 / EP2375701 | EP15152579.7 / EP2892213 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.08.2011 | BE | 31.08.2011 | CY | 31.08.2011 | CZ | 31.08.2011 | DK | 31.08.2011 | EE | 31.08.2011 | FI | 31.08.2011 | HU | 31.08.2011 | IT | 31.08.2011 | LT | 31.08.2011 | LV | 31.08.2011 | MT | 31.08.2011 | PL | 31.08.2011 | RO | 31.08.2011 | SE | 31.08.2011 | SI | 31.08.2011 | SK | 31.08.2011 | TR | 31.08.2011 | BG | 30.11.2011 | GR | 01.12.2011 | IE | 05.12.2011 | LU | 05.12.2011 | ES | 11.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | IS | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | PT | 02.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
TR | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IE | 05.12.2011 | ||
LU | 05.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IE | 05.12.2011 | ||
LU | 05.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IE | 05.12.2011 | ||
LU | 05.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IE | 05.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IE | 05.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IE | 05.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IE | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 31.08.2011 | |
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 31.08.2011 | |
IS | 31.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1063829 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10,13-19 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0085] * * figures 1,2,4-13 * * claims 1-3 * [Y] 11,12; | [YA] - "High-Definition Multimedia Interface. Specification Version 1.3a - Supplement 1 Consumer Electronics Control (CEC)", INTERNET CITATION, (20061110), pages CEC - I - CEC - 97, URL: http://www.hdmi.org/download/HDMISpecification13a.pdf, (20080327), XP009096686 [Y] 11,12 * pages CEC-16 - pages CEC-19 * [A] 1-10,13-19 | by applicant | EP1063829 |