EP1908461 - Use of (1S, 2R) enantiomer of milnacipran for the preparation of a medicine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT 45, Place Abel Gance 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deregnaucourt, Jean 11, Boulevard Edgar Quinet 75014, PARIS / FR | 02 /
Grosse, Richard 319, rue du Bourg 45520, GIDY / FR | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2008/15] | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Régimbeau, 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07123564.2 | 16.02.2004 | [2008/15] | Priority number, date | FR20030001849 | 14.02.2003 Original published format: FR 0301849 | US20030453574 | 03.06.2003 Original published format: US 453574 | [2008/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1908461 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1908461 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/11] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1908461 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/135, A61K31/165 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
A61K31/135 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/195 (EP,US);
A61K31/4015 (EP,US);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/135, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/165, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/195, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4015, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Extension states | AL | 19.12.2007 | LT | 19.12.2007 | LV | 19.12.2007 | MK | 19.12.2007 | Title | German: | Verwendung des Enantiomers (1S, 2R) von Milnacipran zur Herstellung eines Arzneimittels | [2008/15] | English: | Use of (1S, 2R) enantiomer of milnacipran for the preparation of a medicine | [2008/15] | French: | Utilisation de l'énantiomère (1S, 2R) du milnacipran pour la préparation d'un médicament | [2010/42] |
Former [2008/15] | Utilisation de l' énantiomère (1S, 2R) du milnacipran pour la préparation d' un médicament | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 22.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.09.2010 | 28.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04711387.3 / EP1601349 | Divisional application(s) | EP10182592.5 / EP2305225 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.03.2011 | [2011/41] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2759906 (PF MEDICAMENT [FR]) [X] 1-5,7-10 * page 2, line 10 - line 16 * * page 2, line 17 - line 19 * * revendication *; | [X] - BONNAUD B ET AL, "1-Aryl-2-(aminomethyl)cyclopropanecarboxylic acid derivatives. A new series of potential antidepressants", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1987), vol. 30, no. 2, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 318 - 325, XP002282456 [X] 1-10 * example 25 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00385a013 | [X] - DEPREZ D ET AL, "Which bioequivalence study for a racemic drug? Application to milnacipran.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF DRUG METABOLISM AND PHARMACOKINETICS, (1998), vol. 23, no. 2, ISSN 0378-7966, pages 166 - 171, XP008021090 [X] 1-5,7-10 * page 166, column L, paragraph 1 * | [X] - SPENCER CAROLINE M ET AL, "Milnacipran: A review of its use in depression.", DRUGS, (1998), vol. 56, no. 3, ISSN 0012-6667, pages 405 - 427, XP008021105 [X] 1-5,7-10 * page 410, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003495-199856030-00010 | [X] - PUOZZO C ET AL, "Pharmacokinetics of milnacipran in renal impairment.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF DRUG METABOLISM AND PHARMACOKINETICS. SWITZERLAND 1998 APR-JUN, (199804), vol. 23, no. 2, ISSN 0398-7639, pages 280 - 286, XP008021091 [X] 1-5,7-10 * page 280, column R, paragraph 3 * | [X] - VIAZZO P ET AL, "Microbiological Transformations 34: Enantioselective Hydrolysis of a Key-Lactone Involved in the Synthesis of the Antidepressant Milnacipran@?", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19960624), vol. 37, no. 26, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 4519 - 4522, XP004029055 [X] 1-5,7-10 * page 4519, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(96)00872-6 | [X] - SHUTO SATOSHI ET AL, "-1-phenyl-2-((S)-1-aminopropyl)-N,N-diethylcyclopropanecarboxamide (PPDC), a new class of NMDA-receptor antagonist: Molecular design by a novel conformational restriction strategy.", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (200103), vol. 85, no. 3, ISSN 0021-5198, pages 207 - 213, XP008021088 [X] 1-5,7-10 * page 207, abregé * * page 212, column L, paragraph 5 - paragraph 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1254/jjp.85.207 | by applicant | US4478836 | WO9735574 | FR2759290 | EP0939626 | WO0126623 | WO0162236 | - MORET ET AL., NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (1985), vol. 24, no. 12, pages 1211 - 1219 | - PALMIER ET AL., EUR J CLIN PHARMACOL, (1989), vol. 37, pages 235 - 238 | - BONNAUD ET AL., JOURNAL OFCHROMATOGRAPHY, (1985), vol. 318, pages 398 - 403 | - SHUTO ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1996), vol. 37, pages 641 - 644 | - GRARD ET AL., ELECTROPHORESIS, (2000), vol. 21, pages 3028 - 3034 | - DOYLE; HU, ADVANCED SYNTHESIS AND CATALYSIS, (2001), vol. 343, pages 299 - 302 | - NORES ET AL., THéRAPIE, (1987), vol. 42, pages 555 - 558 | - MEADOER-WOODRUFF ET AL., J. CLIM. PSYCHOPHARMACOL., (1988), vol. 8, pages 28 - 32 | - GRAY; WHITTAKER, J. ANAT., (1962), vol. 96, pages 79 - 97 |