EP1903374 - Organic light emitting display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2009/08] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Chan Hee c/o Samsung SDI Co. Ltd Legal & IP Team 428-5, Gongse-ri,Kiheung-eup Yongsin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Oh, Yoon Chan c/o Samsung SDI Co. Ltd. Legal & IP Team 428-5, Gongse-ri, Kiheung-eup Yongsin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Lim, Dae Ho c/o Samsung SDI Co. Ltd. Legal & IP Team 428-5, Gongse-ri, Kiheung-eup Yongsin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07252454.9 | 15.06.2007 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | KR20060091834 | 21.09.2006 Original published format: KR 20060091834 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1903374 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
H10K59/87 (EP);
H05B33/04 (KR);
H10K50/84 (US);
H05B33/02 (KR);
H10K50/841 (US);
H10K59/871 (EP,KR);
G02F2201/503 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, HU [2008/49] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Organische lichtemittierende Anzeigevorrichtung | [2008/13] | English: | Organic light emitting display device | [2008/13] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage électroluminescent organique | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2007 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 24.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2009 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 07.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/52] | 10.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division and information on prior art not received in time [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2758772 (WILLIAMS PHILIP M) [Y] 15-18 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US6149053 (CHATTERTON CHADD R [US], et al) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [XY]US2001035931 (KUMAGAI KEIICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-14,19 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * [Y] 15-18,20,21; | [Y]US2002105605 (HUANG KUN-FENG [TW], et al) [Y] 20 * figures 5a,5b,6 *; | [A]US2006056202 (JUNG DAE-YOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] *; | [Y]US2006072051 (KANG SEOCK-HWAN [KR], et al) [Y] 21 * figure 1 * | Examination | EP1659632 | US2006133018 |