EP1972040 - TERMINAL ADAPTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Savox Communications Oy AB (LTD) Vitikka 4 A 02630 Espoo / FI | [2008/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTERLUND, Mikael Vanha Raide 1 B 35 02610 Espoo / FI | [2008/39] | Representative(s) | Tanhua, Pekka Vilhelm Berggren Oy AB P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Tanhua, Pekka Vilhelm Berggren Oy AB P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 07700264.0 | 11.01.2007 | [2008/39] | WO2007FI00011 | Priority number, date | FI20060000015U | 12.01.2006 Original published format: FI 20060015 U | [2008/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007080220 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1972040 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 19.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01R31/06, H04Q7/32 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
H01R31/06 (EP,KR);
H01R13/443 (EP);
H01R13/5213 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | 26.06.2008 | HR | 26.06.2008 | MK | 26.06.2008 | RS | 26.06.2008 | Title | German: | TERMINAL-ADAPTER | [2008/39] | English: | TERMINAL ADAPTER | [2008/39] | French: | ADAPTATEUR DE TERMINAL | [2008/39] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 26.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/29] | 11.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/30] | 17.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.2010 | 31.01.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2001024904 (FISCHER ROY K [US]) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2002119697 (CHAN WEN-YAO [TW]) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2004017472 (PARK YOUNG-TAE [KR]) [Y] 1,6* figure 3 *; | [Y]US2004121635 (HALTER WILLIAM [US]) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5659236 (HAHN STAN S [US]); | [Y]US5977747 (HUANG HSIN-WEI [TW]); | [A]JP2001313709 (SHARP KK); | [Y]US2002195993 (CHIU CHIU KAI [TW]); | [Y]US2003117104 (LIAO SHENG HSIN [TW]); | [A]WO03058763 (SWIATEK JOHN A [US], et al); | [Y]US2004129522 (SKOWRONSKI RICHARD E [US]); | [Y]US2005032416 (PERESS SASS M [CA], et al); | [A]FR2858739 (COTRON CORP [TW]); | [Y]US2005122424 (OVERSTREET FRANK R [US]); | [A]US6980204 (HAWKINS JEFFREY CHARLES [US], et al) |