EP1977188 - COORDINATE MEASURING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A COORDINATE MEASURING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH Carl Zeiss Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UHL, Peter Enzianstr. 4 73485 Unterschneidheim / DE | 02 /
MAIER, Thomas Schradenbergstr. 7 73434 Aalen / DE | 03 /
GRUPP, Günter Friedhofstrasse 32 89558 Böhmenkirch / DE | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Brunotte, Joachim Wilhelm Eberhard Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Brunotte, Joachim Wilhelm Eberhard Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner Radickestrasse 48 12489 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 07702991.6 | 17.01.2007 | [2008/41] | WO2007EP00584 | Priority number, date | DE20061003362 | 19.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006003362 | [2008/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007082779 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1977188 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1977188 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01B5/008, G01B21/04, G05B19/19 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
G01B5/008 (EP,US);
G01B21/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/07] |
Former [2008/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOORDINATENMESSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES KOORDINATENMESSGERÄTS | [2008/41] | English: | COORDINATE MEASURING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A COORDINATE MEASURING MACHINE | [2008/41] | French: | APPAREIL DE MESURE DE COORDONNEES ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION D'UN APPAREIL DE MESURE DE COORDONNEES | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 20.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.09.2011
04.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Hexagon Technology Center GmbH Heinrich-Wild-Strasse 201 9435 Heerbrugg / CH Opponent's representative Harmann, Bernd-Günther Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.09.2011
Hexagon Technology Center GmbH Heinrich-Wild-Strasse 9435 Heerbrugg / CH Opponent's representative Harmann, Bernd-Günther Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte Est Austrasse 79 9490 Vaduz / LI | 09.11.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.05.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.12.2013 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 20.04.2014 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/26] | Appeal following opposition | 06.02.2014 | Appeal received No. T0277/14 | 20.04.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.01.2014 | [2014/51] | Cited in | International search | [A]US5189806 (MCMURTRY DAVID R [GB], et al); | [A]DE19508861 (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]); | [DX]DE10024976 (MIDDEX ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE10024976 | US2001013177 |