EP1982283 - A SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR CYBER-EXPO OPERATING MULTI-EXHIBITION AND MANAGING CUMULATIVE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simbio Co., Ltd. 204 2Hogwan Sahnhakhyupdong Hoseo University Sechulree Baebahngmyun Ahsansi, Chungnam 336-795 / KR | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jong-Hyang 107-206 Guekdong Apt. Doojeongdong Cheonahnsi Chungnam 330-210 / KR | 02 /
SOHN, Surg-Won 406-505 Joogong Apt. 164 Sangil-dong Gangdong-gu Seoul 134-794 / KR | 03 /
KWON, Young-Hoon 102 1302-14 Seocho4-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-074 / KR | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Bertsch, Florian Oliver, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Bertsch, Florian Oliver, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07708752.6 | 05.02.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007KR00601 | Priority number, date | KR20060011411 | 07.02.2006 Original published format: KR 20060011411 | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007091806 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1982283 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, G06Q30/00, G06F17/30 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
G09B25/04 (EP,US);
B63C9/065 (KR);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/43] | G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR CYBER-EXPO-BETRIEB EINER MEHRFACHAUSSTELLUNG UND ZUR VERWALTUNG KUMULATIVER DATEN | [2008/43] | English: | A SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR CYBER-EXPO OPERATING MULTI-EXHIBITION AND MANAGING CUMULATIVE DATA | [2008/43] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CYBER-PRÉSENTATION POUR EXPOSITIONS MULTIPLES ET DE GESTIONS DE DONNÉES CUMULATIVES | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 11.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/27] | 10.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.08.2009 | 28.02.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.2010 | 29.02.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]KR100632955B (SYMBIO CO LTD [KR]) [XP] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [I]US2002161663 (KANG SANG-HYUN [KR], et al) [I] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0026] *; | [I]US2003004791 (KOJIMA KAZUO [JP]) [I] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0025] - [0042] *; | [A]US2002004755 (BALTHASER NEIL [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0033] * | International search | [A]KR100358395B (LEE JUNG GON [KR]); | [A]KR20040057254 (KOREA INST SCI & TECH INF); | [A]KR20010025522 (DIGITAL INNER CORE CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20000030796 (NOH SAM HWAN [KR], et al); | [A]KR20000030491 (CHUN BYUNG NYUN [KR], et al) |