Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1982283
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.06.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
30.03.2012 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.02.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.08.2011 |
First examination report |
|
24.08.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.04.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.09.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] |
10.09.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] |
23.07.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
23.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.08.2009 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
25.08.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2009 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.09.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
19.09.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
03.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.08.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.08.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|