Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009177659 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007KR00601 | 05.02.2007 | KR20060011411 | 07.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1982283 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2010 | A4 | EP1982283 | 22.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007KR00601 | 05.02.2007 | KR20060011411 | 07.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007091806 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20060011411 | 07.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100632955B | Global Dossier | 11.10.2006 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KR20060011411 | 07.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101395612 | 25.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20060011411 | 07.02.2006 |