18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
14.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
17.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] |
10.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
20.05.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] |
30.04.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] |
09.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
02.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
01.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] |
22.05.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] |
22.05.2009 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] |
04.05.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.05.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.01.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.01.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.01.2009 |
First examination report |
|
13.11.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
13.11.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
11.10.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.10.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.12.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.12.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|