Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8348245 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2013 | B2 | US2010133708 | 03.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006014814 | 29.03.2006 | DE102006048456 | 11.10.2006 | DE102006048457 | 11.10.2006 | WO2007EP02718 | 28.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4850947B | Global Dossier | 11.01.2012 | B2 | JP2009531168 | 03.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006014814 | 29.03.2006 | DE102006048456 | 11.10.2006 | DE102006048457 | 11.10.2006 | WO2007EP02718 | 28.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007234086B | Global Dossier | 05.08.2010 | B2 | AU2007234086 | 11.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006014814 | 29.03.2006 | DE102006048456 | 11.10.2006 | DE102006048457 | 11.10.2006 | WO2007EP02718 | 28.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1998878 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2009 | B1 | EP1998878 | 10.12.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102006014814 | 29.03.2006 | DE102006048456 | 11.10.2006 | DE102006048457 | 11.10.2006 | WO2007EP02718 | 28.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE434481T | 15.07.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006014814 | 29.03.2006 | DE102006048456 | 11.10.2006 | DE102006048457 | 11.10.2006 | WO2007EP02718 | 28.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0709203 | 28.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102006014814 | 29.03.2006 | DE102006048456 | 11.10.2006 | DE102006048457 | 11.10.2006 | WO2007EP02718 | 28.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2646162 | 11.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006014814 | 29.03.2006 | DE102006048456 | 11.10.2006 | DE102006048457 | 11.10.2006 | WO2007EP02718 | 28.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101410170 | 15.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006014814 | 29.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006014814 | 18.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006014814 | 29.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006048456 | 10.12.2009 | B4 | DE102006048456 | 24.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006048456 | 11.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006048457 | 24.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006048457 | 11.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502007000947D1 | 06.08.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006014814 | 29.03.2006 | DE102006048456 | 11.10.2006 | DE102006048457 | 11.10.2006 | WO2007EP02718 | 28.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1998878T | 02.11.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102006014814 | 29.03.2006 | DE102006048456 | 11.10.2006 | DE102006048457 | 11.10.2006 | WO2007EP02718 | 28.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2008012313 | 12.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006014814 | 29.03.2006 | DE102006048456 | 11.10.2006 | DE102006048457 | 11.10.2006 | WO2007EP02718 | 28.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2008142747 | 10.05.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006014814 | 29.03.2006 | DE102006048456 | 11.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007112892 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2007 | A3 | WO2007112892 | 11.10.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102006014814 | 29.03.2006 | DE102006048456 | 11.10.2006 | DE102006048457 | 11.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2328870T | 18.11.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102006014814 | 29.03.2006 | DE102006048456 | 11.10.2006 | DE102006048457 | 11.10.2006 |