EP1998878 - IMPREGNATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): RO | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carbotek Holding GmbH Ankergasse 4 86720 Nördlingen / DE | [2008/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHER, Georg Ahornstrasse 4 86738 Deiningen / DE | [2008/50] | Representative(s) | Munk, Ludwig Patentanwälte Munk Prinzregentenstrasse 3 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | Munk, Ludwig Patentanwälte Munk Prinzregentenstrasse 3 86150 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07723664.4 | 28.03.2007 | [2008/50] | WO2007EP02718 | Priority number, date | DE20061014814 | 29.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006014814 | DE20061048456 | 11.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006048456 | DE20061048457 | 11.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006048457 | [2008/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007112892 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1998878 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1998878 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/04, B01F5/06 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
B01F23/232 (EP,US);
B67D1/0059 (EP,US);
B01F23/236 (EP,US);
B01F25/3131 (EP,US);
B01F25/4522 (EP,US);
B01F35/8331 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7837 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPRÄGNIERER | [2008/50] | English: | IMPREGNATOR | [2008/50] | French: | IMPREGNATEUR | [2008/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.06.2009 | CZ | 24.06.2009 | EE | 24.06.2009 | FI | 24.06.2009 | IT | 24.06.2009 | LT | 24.06.2009 | LV | 24.06.2009 | MT | 24.06.2009 | PL | 24.06.2009 | RO | 24.06.2009 | SI | 24.06.2009 | SK | 24.06.2009 | TR | 24.06.2009 | BG | 24.09.2009 | SE | 24.09.2009 | GR | 25.09.2009 | IS | 24.10.2009 | PT | 24.10.2009 | HU | 25.12.2009 | [2014/34] |
Former [2012/47] | CY | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
MT | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
TR | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
HU | 25.12.2009 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
MT | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
HU | 25.12.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
MT | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
MT | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | FI | 24.06.2009 | |
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB340503 (ERNST COHNITZ) [A] 1-10,41-44 * page 1, line 60 - page 1, line 99; figure 1 *; | [A]US2417670 (ANTHES CLIFFORD C) [A] 1-10,41-44 * column 2, line 22 - column 5, line 21; figures 1,3,4,6 *; | [A]FR982264 (J FENART & CIE ETS) [A] 21-40* abstract *; | [DXY]US3761066 (WHEELER C) [DX] 1-3,5,41-44 * column 3, line 51 - column 3, line 54; figures 1,2; claims 1-5 * [Y] 35-40; | [A]DE29707300U (GOEKE HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1-10,41-44 * abstract *; | [A]DE20004007U (PREISENDANZ HANS [DE], et al) [A] 1-10,41-44 * page 3; figure 1; claims 1-3 *; | [XY]US2003037823 (PICKELMAN DALE M [US]) [X] 21-25,27,28,30 * abstract * [Y] 35-40; | [A]US2003168754 (SPIEGEL PASQUALE [DE], et al) [A] 1-10,41-44 * paragraph [0049]; figure 4 *; | [X]US2005098216 (BODIE CAMERON D [CA]) [X] 21-25 * abstract *; | [A]WO2005105279 (SPIEGEL MARGRET [DE], et al) [A] 1-10,41-44 * page 5 - page 6; figure 1; claim 1 * |