15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
17.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
18.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
17.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
28.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
21.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] |
14.11.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
22.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
06.12.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
30.11.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
30.11.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.08.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] |
08.05.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.08.2010 |
First examination report |
|
13.08.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.05.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.12.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] |
05.12.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] |
21.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.12.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|