Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8181993 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2012 | B2 | US2009134618 | 28.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP03219 | 11.04.2007 | DE102006055787 | 27.11.2006 | DE102006017159 | 13.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2010399 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2014 | B1 | EP2010399 | 07.01.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP03219 | 11.04.2007 | DE102006055787 | 27.11.2006 | DE102006017159 | 13.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2648995 | 21.07.2015 | C | CA2648995 | 25.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP03219 | 11.04.2007 | DE102006055787 | 27.11.2006 | DE102006017159 | 13.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101472745B | 01.12.2010 | B | CN101472745 | 01.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP03219 | 11.04.2007 | DE102006055787 | 27.11.2006 | DE102006017159 | 13.04.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007118654 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2008 | A3 | WO2007118654 | 25.10.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102006055787 | 27.11.2006 | DE102006017159 | 13.04.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006055787 | 18.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006055787 | 27.11.2006 | DE102006017159 | 13.04.2006 |