EP2032544 - CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF LETROZOLE AND PROCESSES FOR MAKING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthon B.V. Microweg 22 6545 CM Nijmegen / NL | [2009/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTHEIM, Raymond Jozef Hubertus De Bongerd 18 5345 JT OSS / NL | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al Arnold & Siedsma PO Box 18558 2502 EN The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al Arnold & Siedsma PO Box 18558 2502 EN The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2010/23] | Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al Bird & Bird LLP P.O. Box 30311 2500 GH Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2009/11] | Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 07724955.5 | 03.05.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007EP04031 | Priority number, date | US20060797607P | 04.05.2006 Original published format: US 797607 P | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007128561 | Date: | 15.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2032544 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/08, A61K31/4196, A61P35/00 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/11] | Title | German: | KRISTALLINE FORMEN VON LETROZOL UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2009/11] | English: | CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF LETROZOLE AND PROCESSES FOR MAKING THEM | [2009/11] | French: | FORMES CRISTALLINES DU LÉTROZOLE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 21.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 14.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.08.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 11.08.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - WANG J ET AL, "Synthesis, characterization and single crystal structure of 4,4'-(1H-1,2,4-triazol-1-methylene)bisbenzonitrile", CHINESE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMSITRY, (2004), vol. 24, pages 550 - 553, XP009089579 [X] 1-5 * abstract * | [X] - XU X-Y ET AL, "The crystal structure of 4,4'-(1H-1,2,4-triazol-1-ylmethylen)bis benzonitrile", JOURNAL OF HUAIHAI INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 30 - 33, XP009089583 [X] 1-5 * abstract * |