Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8094054 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2012 | B2 | US2010302083 | 02.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06300292 | 28.03.2006 | WO2007IB50953 | 19.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009531924 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | EP06300292 | 28.03.2006 | WO2007IB50953 | 19.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2002632 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2015 | B1 | EP2002632 | 17.12.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP07735179 | 19.03.2007 | EP06300292 | 28.03.2006 | WO2007IB50953 | 19.03.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007110805 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2007 | A3 | WO2007110805 | 04.10.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP06300292 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101411155 | 15.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | EP06300292 | 28.03.2006 |