EP2041395 - ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION OF A ROCK REINFORCING BOLT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atlas Copco Rock Drills AB 701 14 Örebro / SE | [2017/16] |
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states Atlas Copco Rock Drills AB 701 14 Örebro / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUSTAVSSON, Hans Sigillgatan 55 703 78 Örebro / SE | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB Drottninggatan 33, plan 4 111 51 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/14] | Janson, Ronny, et al Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07748210.7 | 07.06.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007SE00547 | Priority number, date | SE20060001569 | 17.07.2006 Original published format: SE 0601569 | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008010757 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2041395 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2041395 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E21D20/00, E21B47/09, E21B7/02 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
E21D20/003 (EP,SE);
E21B47/09 (EP,SE);
E21B7/022 (EP);
E21B7/025 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/14] | E21D20/00, E21B47/09 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/16] |
Former [2009/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER POSITION EINES FELSVERSTÄRKUNGSBOLZENS | [2009/14] | English: | ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION OF A ROCK REINFORCING BOLT | [2009/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR DÉTERMINER LA POSITION D'UN BOULON DE CONSOLIDATION DE ROCHE | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2008 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 22.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2007 | AT | 19.04.2017 | CY | 19.04.2017 | CZ | 19.04.2017 | DK | 19.04.2017 | EE | 19.04.2017 | ES | 19.04.2017 | IT | 19.04.2017 | LT | 19.04.2017 | LV | 19.04.2017 | MC | 19.04.2017 | NL | 19.04.2017 | PL | 19.04.2017 | PT | 19.04.2017 | RO | 19.04.2017 | SE | 19.04.2017 | SI | 19.04.2017 | SK | 19.04.2017 | TR | 19.04.2017 | IE | 07.06.2017 | LU | 07.06.2017 | MT | 07.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | FR | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | BG | 19.07.2017 | GB | 19.07.2017 | GR | 20.07.2017 | IS | 19.08.2017 | DE | 03.01.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 07.06.2007 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
MT | 07.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GB | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 07.06.2007 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
MT | 07.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GB | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.06.2007 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
MT | 07.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GB | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
MT | 07.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GB | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GB | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GB | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GB | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GB | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/20] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 19.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4158520 (PREBENSEN SOREN P); | [YA]US6349249 (CUNNINGHAM PETER D [CA]); | [A]WO2004055326 (LMS GEOTECHNICAL PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [A]WO2004085968 (SANDVIK TAMROCK OY [FI], et al); | [XP]WO2006078198 (ATLAS COPCO ROCK DRILLS AB [SE], et al); | [XP]WO2007000492 (SANDVIK MINING & CONSTR OY [FI], et al) | International search | [A]EP0267181 (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]); | [A]US6203111 (OLLIS MARK [US], et al); | [A]WO0169041 (SANDVIK TAMROCK OY [FI], et al); | [A]US6349249 (CUNNINGHAM PETER D [CA]) |