EP2013728 - METHODS AND APPARATUS PROVIDING COMPUTER AND NETWORK SECURITY FOR POLYMORPHIC ATTACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAEMER, Jeffrey A. 27 Kenilworth Road Wellesley, Massachusetts 02482 / US | 02 /
ZAWADOWSKIY, Andrew 6-2 Colburn Lane Hollis NH 03049 / US | [2009/13] |
Former [2009/03] | 01 /
KRAEMER, Jeffrey A. 27 Kenilworth Road Wellesley, Massachusetts 02482 / US | ||
02 /
ZAWADOWSKIY, Andrew 56 Bartemus Trail Nashua, New Hampshire 03063 / US | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/05] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/03] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07756155.3 | 30.04.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007US10454 | Priority number, date | US20060414910 | 01.05.2006 Original published format: US 414910 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007130354 | Date: | 15.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2013728 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2013728 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00, H04L29/06 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
H04L63/1408 (EP,US);
G06F21/564 (EP,US);
G06F21/566 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/03] | G06F11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE COMPUTER- UND NETZWERKSICHERHEIT FÜR POLYMORPHE ANGRIFFE | [2009/03] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS PROVIDING COMPUTER AND NETWORK SECURITY FOR POLYMORPHIC ATTACKS | [2009/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR ASSURER LA SÉCURITÉ INFORMATIQUE ET DE RÉSEAU | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 15.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2007 | AT | 30.01.2013 | BE | 30.01.2013 | CY | 30.01.2013 | CZ | 30.01.2013 | DK | 30.01.2013 | EE | 30.01.2013 | FI | 30.01.2013 | IT | 30.01.2013 | LT | 30.01.2013 | LV | 30.01.2013 | MC | 30.01.2013 | MT | 30.01.2013 | NL | 30.01.2013 | PL | 30.01.2013 | RO | 30.01.2013 | SE | 30.01.2013 | SI | 30.01.2013 | SK | 30.01.2013 | TR | 30.01.2013 | BG | 30.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | FR | 30.04.2013 | IE | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | LU | 30.04.2013 | GR | 01.05.2013 | ES | 11.05.2013 | IS | 30.05.2013 | PT | 30.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
MT | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
TR | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
FR | 30.04.2013 | ||
IE | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
MT | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
FR | 30.04.2013 | ||
IE | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
FR | 30.04.2013 | ||
IE | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
FR | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 30.01.2013 | |
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 30.01.2013 | |
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 30.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006064755 (AZADET KAMERAN [US], et al) [I] 1-4,6,9-15,17-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] *; | [I]US2004064737 (MILLIKEN WALTER CLARK [US], et al) [I] 1-4,6,9-15,17-20 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068] *; | [I]US2005166268 (SZOR PETER [US]) [I] 1-4,6,9-15,17-20 * abstract *; | [A]US2002078381 (FARLEY TIMOTHY P [US], et al) [A] 1-4,6,9-15,17-20 * abstract *; | [A]EP1418484 (STONESOFT CORP [FI]) [A] 1-4,6,9-15,17-20 * abstract * | International search | [X]US5696822 (NACHENBERG CAREY [US]) | by applicant | US2006064755 |