EP2047697 - CUSTOMIZING A RADIO COMMUNICATION TERMINAL COMPRISING A SIM CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/16] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CUSTOMIZING A RADIO COMMUNICATION TERMINAL, CORRESPONDING RADIO COMMUNICATION TERMINAL, SIM CARD, SERVER, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT AND STORAGE MEANS | ||
[2012/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wavecom Immeuble Bord de Seine I 3 Esplanade du Foncet 92442 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [2009/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONTES, Jacques 35 bis, rue des Arts 94170 Le Perreux Sur Marne / FR | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Guéné, Patrick Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Guéné, Patrick Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | ||
Former [2009/16] | Guéné, Patrick Lucien Juan Joseph Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 F-35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07788064.9 | 31.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007EP57868 | Priority number, date | FR20060007042 | 01.08.2006 Original published format: FR 0607042 | [2009/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008015206 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2047697 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2047697 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/18 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
H04W8/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/17] | H04W88/02, H04W4/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/16] | H04Q7/32, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Title | German: | ANPASSUNG EINES FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄTS MIT SIM-KARTE | [2012/21] | English: | CUSTOMIZING A RADIO COMMUNICATION TERMINAL COMPRISING A SIM CARD | [2012/21] | French: | PERSONNALISATION D'UN TERMINAL DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION COMPRENANT UNE CARTE SIM | [2012/21] |
Former [2009/16] | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR ANPASSUNG EINES FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄTS, ENTSPRECHENDES FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT, SIM-KARTE, SERVER, COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT UND SPEICHERMITTEL | ||
Former [2009/16] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CUSTOMIZING A RADIO COMMUNICATION TERMINAL, CORRESPONDING RADIO COMMUNICATION TERMINAL, SIM CARD, SERVER, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT AND STORAGE MEANS | ||
Former [2009/16] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PERSONNALISATION D'UN TERMINAL DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION, TERMINAL DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION, CARTE SIM, SERVEUR, PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR ET MOYEN DE STOCKAGE CORRESPONDANTS | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 15.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2007 | AT | 10.10.2012 | CY | 10.10.2012 | CZ | 10.10.2012 | DK | 10.10.2012 | EE | 10.10.2012 | FI | 10.10.2012 | IT | 10.10.2012 | LT | 10.10.2012 | LV | 10.10.2012 | MC | 10.10.2012 | MT | 10.10.2012 | NL | 10.10.2012 | PL | 10.10.2012 | RO | 10.10.2012 | SE | 10.10.2012 | SI | 10.10.2012 | SK | 10.10.2012 | TR | 10.10.2012 | BG | 10.01.2013 | GR | 11.01.2013 | ES | 21.01.2013 | IS | 10.02.2013 | PT | 11.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
MT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
TR | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 10.10.2012 | |
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 10.10.2012 | |
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 10.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03077585 (SCHLUMBERGER SYSTEMS & SERVICE [FR], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 2, line 2 - line 10 * * page 3, line 6 - page 4, line 27 * * page 6, line 6 - line 25 * * page 7, line 12 - page 11, line 5 * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]WO03039176 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 1, line 11 - page 2, line 11 * * page 5, line 19 - page 7, line 25 * * page 14, line 24 - page 15, line 19 * * figures 10-12 *; | [XY]WO0176309 (WIRELESSCAR SWEDEN AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,15-20 * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 7 * * page 7, line 10 - page 8, line 11 * * page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 7 * * page 12, line 1 - line 22 * * figure 1 * [Y] 2-14; | [YX]US2003120920 (SVENSSON SVEN ANDERS BORJE [US]) [Y] 2-14 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1, paragraph 6 - page 2, paragraph 14 * * page 3, paragraph 26 - page 4, paragraph 27 * [X] 1,15-20 | by applicant | WO03077585 | WO0176309 | US2003120920 |