EP2065960 - METHOD FOR EVALUATING DURABILITY OF UNIT CELL, DEVICE FOR EVALUATING DURABILITY, PROGRAM FOR EVALUATING DURABILITY, AND UNIT CELL OF FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHITOBI, Masamitsu 2-13-1-5-104, Umezono Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0045 / JP | 02 /
NAKAZONO, Akiko 2-8-7-306, Sengen Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0047 / JP | 03 /
SAITO, Shin 2-13-10-306, Amakubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0005 / JP | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07807182.6 | 06.09.2007 | [2009/23] | WO2007JP67775 | Priority number, date | JP20060243130 | 07.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006243130 | [2009/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008029954 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2065960 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/10, H01M8/02 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
H01M8/04305 (EP,US);
H01M8/0263 (EP,US);
H01M8/0271 (US);
H01M2008/1095 (EP,US);
H01M8/04492 (EP,US);
H01M8/04679 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/23] | H01M8/04, H01M8/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EVALUIEREN DER DAUERHAFTIGKEIT EINER EINHEITSZELLE, EINRICHTUNG ZUM EVALUIEREN DER DAUERHAFTIGKEIT, PROGRAMM ZUM EVALUIEREN DER DAUERHAFTIGKEIT UND EINHEITSZELLE FÜR EINE BRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2009/23] | English: | METHOD FOR EVALUATING DURABILITY OF UNIT CELL, DEVICE FOR EVALUATING DURABILITY, PROGRAM FOR EVALUATING DURABILITY, AND UNIT CELL OF FUEL CELL | [2009/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET PROGRAMME D'ÉVALUATION DE DURABILITÉ DE PILE UNITAIRE ET PILE UNITAIRE DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE | [2009/23] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2009 | Translation filed | 03.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 16.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/41] | 22.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2004014331 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2005353399 (ESPEC CORP); | [A]JPH11354140 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV); | [A]JP2006216441 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [A]JP2002313365 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) | by applicant | JPH08259710 | JP2000215903 | JP2005108777 | JP2003068318 | JP2003238678 | - IWANAMI RIKAGAKUJITEN, IWANAMI SHOTEN, (1998), vol. 5, page 1149 | - K. D. KREUER, JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 185, pages 29 - 39 |