Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009544452 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US74561 | 27.07.2007 | US82065706 | 28.07.2006 | US82900707 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2046417 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2010 | A4 | EP2046417 | 15.04.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US74561 | 27.07.2007 | US82065706 | 28.07.2006 | US82900707 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0715526 | 25.06.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US74561 | 27.07.2007 | US82065706 | 28.07.2006 | US82900707 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101495164 | 29.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US82065706 | 28.07.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008014439 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2008 | A3 | WO2008014439 | 31.01.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US82065706 | 28.07.2006 | US82900707 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008027415 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82065706 | 28.07.2006 | US82900707 | 26.07.2007 |