EP2046417 - VASCULAR ACCESS DEVICE VOLUME DISPLACEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCKINNON, Austin Jason 5618 Adeline Court Herriman, Utah 84065 / US | 02 /
STOUT, Marty L. 7869 South 1960 East South Weber, Utah 84405 / US | 03 /
CRAWFORD, Mark A. 1067 Pineridge Road Sandy, Utah 84094 / US | 04 /
HARDING, Weston F. 2421 North 910 West Lehi, Utah 84043 / US | 05 /
SQUIRE, Sean 11982 Pond Ridge Road Draper, Utah 84020 / US | 06 /
DAVIS, Bryan G. 1 Quietwood Lane Sandy, Utah 84092 / US | 07 /
MINER, Thomas M. 647 North Hillside Circle Alpine, UT 84004 / US | 08 /
ADAMS, Chad M. 7037 Swan Hill Drive West Jordan, Utah 84084 / US | 09 /
CINDRICH, Christopher N. 1803 Seven Oaks Lane Draper, Utah 84020 / US | 10 /
ISAACSON, Ray, S. 4360 South 2175 West Roy, Utah 84067 / US | [2009/40] |
Former [2009/16] | 01 /
MCKINNON, Austin Jason 5618 Adeline Court Herriman, Utah 84065 / US | ||
02 /
STOUT, Marty L. 7869 South 1960 East South Weber, Utah 84405 / US | |||
03 /
CRAWFORD, Mark A. 1067 Pineridge Road Sandy, Utah 84094 / US | |||
04 /
HARDING, Weston F. 2421 North 910 West Lehi, Utah 84043 / US | |||
05 /
SQUIRE, Sean 11982 Pond Ridge Road Draper, Utah 84020 / US | |||
06 /
DAVIS, Bryan G. 1 Quietwood Lane Sandy, Utah 84092 / US | |||
07 /
MINER, Thomas M. 2228 West 13035 South Riverton, Utah 84065 / US | |||
08 /
ADAMS, Chad M. 7037 Swan Hill Drive West Jordan, Utah 84084 / US | |||
09 /
CINDRICH, Christopher N. 1803 Seven Oaks Lane Draper, Utah 84020 / US | |||
10 /
ISAACSON, Ray, S. 4360 South 2175 West Roy, Utah 84067 / US | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/16] | von Kirschbaum, Alexander Patent Attorneys von Kreisler Selting Werner, Deichmannhaus am Dom, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 07813450.9 | 27.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007US74561 | Priority number, date | US20060820657P | 28.07.2006 Original published format: US 820657 P | US20070829007 | 26.07.2007 Original published format: US 829007 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008014439 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2046417 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/00, A61M31/00 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
A61M25/0097 (EP,US);
A61M39/045 (EP,US);
A61M39/26 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0025 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0036 (EP,US);
A61M2039/261 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VOLUMENVERSCHIEBUNG EINER GEFÄSSZUGANGSVORRICHTUNG | [2009/16] | English: | VASCULAR ACCESS DEVICE VOLUME DISPLACEMENT | [2009/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACCÈS VASCULAIRE À DÉPLACEMENT DE VOLUME | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 11.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/44] | 11.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2416391 (HIXSON CHARLES R) [A] 4* column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 46; figures 8-11 *; | [X]WO9958186 (ICU MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,10,12-15 * page 1, lines 21-24 * * page 2, lines 14-15,26-29 * * page 21, line 24 - page 23, line 3; figures 34,35 * * page 26, line 12 - page 27, line 4; figures 51,52 *; | [X]US2005222541 (LOPEZ GEORGE A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0012] - [0015] * * paragraphs [0051] - [0150]; figures 4-29 * | International search | [X]US6428520 (LOPEZ GEORGE A [US], et al); | [X]US6695817 (FANGROW JR THOMAS F [US]) |