09.09.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] |
01.06.2016 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.12.2015 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.12.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
06.02.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.11.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] |
28.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.10.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.09.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
05.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.02.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.12.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.12.2012 |
First examination report |
|
30.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
28.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.05.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] |
29.05.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] |
15.04.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.03.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.03.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|