EP2074835 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT IN A TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDTP Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2014/52] |
Former [2009/27] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAZMI, Muhammad, Ali Svartviksslingan 110, 3 Tr S-167 39 Bromma / SE | 02 /
RACZ, András Lónyay 19 III/4 H-1093 Budapest / HU | 03 /
BERGSTRÖM, Karl, Olof, Joakim Eriksbergsgatan 42 S-114 30 Stockholm / SE | 04 /
PEISA, Janne Metsäpirtintie 12D17 FI-02130 Espoo / FI | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Johansson, Magnus, et al Awapatent AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | ||
Former [2009/27] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07818921.4 | 11.10.2007 | [2009/27] | WO2007EP08850 | Priority number, date | SE20060002152 | 12.10.2006 Original published format: SE 0602152 | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008043560 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2074835 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/00 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W36/0085 (EP,US);
H04W36/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2009/27] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT IN A TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2009/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET AGENCEMENT DANS UN SYSTÈME DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION | [2009/27] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 10.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/41] | 02.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006223557 (MANOHAR BOLLAPRAGADA V J [US]) [A] 1-28 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0049] - [0056] - [0062] , [0063] *; | [A] - SAMSUNG, "R2-061364 Measurement gap creation", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 #53, SHANGHAI, CHINA, 8-12 MAY 2006, (20060503), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_53/Documents/, (20080220), XP002470107 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * | [PX] - ERICSSON, "R2-063227 Idle Gaps for Handover Measurements in E-UTRAN", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 #56, RIGA, LATVIA, 6-10 NOV 2006, (20061101), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_56/Documents/, (20080220), XP002470104 [PX] 1-28 * the whole document * | [A] - ERICSSON, "R2-062865 Idle Gaps for Handover Measurements in E-UTRAN", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 #55, SEOUL, KOREA, 9-13 OCT 2006, (20061005), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_55/Documents/, (20080220), XP002470105 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * | [A] - SHARP, "R2-062928 Measurement Gap Control for E-UTRAN", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 #55, SEOUL, KOREA, 9-13 OCT 2006, (20061005), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_55/Documents/, (20080220), XP002470106 [A] 1-28 * Section 2.5 * | by applicant | US2006223557 |