EP2086341 - SOLUBLE FOAMING BEVERAGE POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.09.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2020 | Revocation of patent | published on 21.10.2020 [2020/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH | [2019/28] |
Former [2017/42] | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WYSS, Christophe Alexander A1-ph2 Changkat Bandar Utama 2 PJU 6 Bandar Utama Petaling Jaya, 47800 / MY | 02 /
GUMY, Jean-Claude Ch. du Cotter 12 CH-1433 Suchy / CH | 03 /
WARNERY, Philippe, François Rue des Moulins 62 CH-1400 Yverdon-les-bains / CH | 04 /
BOURGEOIS, Thierry Rue du Moulinet 4 CH-1350 Orbe / CH | [2012/48] |
Former [2009/33] | 01 /
WYSS, Christophe Alexander A1-ph2 Changkat Bandar Utama 2 PJU 6 Bandar Utama Petaling Jaya, 47800 / MY | ||
02 /
GUMY, Jean-Claude Ch. du Cotter 12 CH-1433 Suchy / CH | |||
03 /
WARNERY, Philippe, François Rue des Moulins 62 CH-1400 Yverdon-les-bains / CH | |||
04 /
BOURGEOIS, Thierry Rue du Moulinet 4 CH-1350 Orbe / CH | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Cogniat, Eric Jean Marie Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2009/33] | Cogniat, Eric Jean Marie Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 07821936.7 | 29.10.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007EP61576 | Priority number, date | EP20060123303 | 01.11.2006 Original published format: EP 06123303 | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008052952 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2086341 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2086341 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A23F5/40, A23C11/00 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
A23F5/40 (EP,KR,US);
A23L2/52 (KR);
A23C11/00 (EP,KR,US);
A23C2210/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Title | German: | LÖSLICHES SCHÄUMENDES GETRÄNKEPULVER | [2009/33] | English: | SOLUBLE FOAMING BEVERAGE POWDER | [2009/33] | French: | POUDRE SOLUBLE POUR BOISSON MOUSSANTE | [2009/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12162948.9 / EP2474234 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.08.2013
22.11.2013
ADMISSIBLE Mondelez Global LLC Three Parkway North Deerfield, IL 60015 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | 02
28.08.2013
16.02.2016
WITHDRAWN Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE Opponent's representative Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.08.2013
22.11.2013
ADMISSIBLE Mondelez Global LLC Three Parkway North Deerfield, IL 60015 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant LLP 5th Floor, Salisbury Square House 8, Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | ||
02
28.08.2013
16.02.2016
WITHDRAWN Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE Opponent's representative Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.08.2013
22.11.2013
ADMISSIBLE Mondelez Global LLC Three Parkway North Deerfield, IL 60015 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
02
28.08.2013
22.11.2013
WITHDRAWN Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE Opponent's representative Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2013/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.08.2013
ADMISSIBLE Mondelez Global LLC Three Parkway North Deerfield, IL 60015 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
02
28.08.2013
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE Opponent's representative Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2013/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.08.2013
Mondelez Global LLC Three Parkway North Deerfield, IL 60015 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | 10.10.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.04.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.12.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.12.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.02.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/43] | 06.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 10.02.2016 | Appeal received No. T0300/16 | 11.04.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.02.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 09.02.2016 | Appeal received No. T0300/16 | 08.04.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.02.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 04.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.02.2020 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.11.2012 | CZ | 28.11.2012 | DK | 28.11.2012 | EE | 28.11.2012 | IS | 28.11.2012 | LT | 28.11.2012 | LV | 28.11.2012 | MC | 28.11.2012 | MT | 28.11.2012 | RO | 28.11.2012 | SI | 28.11.2012 | SK | 28.11.2012 | IE | 29.10.2013 | LU | 29.10.2013 | BG | 08.08.2017 | [2019/10] |
Former [2016/32] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
IS | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
MT | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2013 | ||
LU | 29.10.2013 | ||
BG | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/41] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
MT | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2013 | ||
LU | 29.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2013 | ||
LU | 29.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 28.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP0888066 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [DX] 1-19 * page 2, paragraphs 11,12 * * page 3, paragraph 18 * * page 5, paragraph 38; example 3; claim 1 *; | [DA]WO0108504 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [DA] 1-19 * page 3, line 1 - line 10 * * page 8, line 15 - line 16; claim 1 *; | [DA]EP1064850 (KRAFT FOODS INC [US]) [DA] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]WO03099030 (KRAFT FOODS HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 5, paragraph 12; claims 1,3 *; | [A]US2005276898 (PASCUAL TERESITA B [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0010]; example 1 * | by applicant | EP0154192 | EP0458310 | EP0885566 | WO2006023565 | WO2006023564 | WO0108504 |