EP2073810 - USE OF 2-6-(3-AMINO-PIPERIDIN-1-YL)-3-METHYL-2,4-DIOXO-3,4-DIHYDRO-2H-PYRIMIDIN-1-YLMETHYL-4-FLUORO-BENZONITRILE FOR TREATING DIABETES, CANCER, AUTOIMMUNE DISORDERS AND HIV INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/27] | USE OF 2-6-(3-AMINO-PIPERIDIN-1-YL)-3-METHYL-2,4-DIOXO-3,4-DIHYDRO-2H-PYRIMIDIN-1-YLMETHYL-4-FLUORO-BENZONITRILE COMPOUND FOR TREATING DIABETES, CANCER, AUTOIMMUNE DISORDERS AND HIV INFECTION | ||
[2011/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IS | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka- shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [2009/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTOPHER, Ronald J. 1059 Snipe Court Carlsbad, CA 92011 / US | 02 /
OGAWA, Atsushi Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka 532-8686 / JP | 03 /
COVINGTON, Paul 3116 Braemar Lane Wilmington, North Carolina 28409 / US | [2011/35] |
Former [2009/27] | 01 /
CHRISTOPHER, Ronald J. 1059 Snipe Court Carlsbad, CA 92011 / US | ||
02 /
OGAWA, Atsushi Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka 532-8686 / JP | |||
03 /
COVINGTON, Paul 3116 Braemar Lane Wilmington, North Carolina 28409 / US | Representative(s) | Duncan, Garreth Andrew, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Duncan, Garreth Andrew, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07842260.7 | 11.09.2007 | [2009/27] | WO2007US78177 | Priority number, date | WO2006US35958 | 13.09.2006 Original published format: PCT/US2006/035958 | US20070894628P | 13.03.2007 Original published format: US 894628 P | [2011/14] |
Former [2009/27] | WO2006US03595 | 13.09.2006 | |
US20070894628P | 13.03.2007 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008033851 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2073810 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2073810 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/513, A61P3/10, A61P35/00, A61P31/18, A61P5/50 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (KR,NO);
A61K9/2018 (KR);
A61K31/4439 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP,KR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4439, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Extension states | AL | 31.03.2009 | BA | 31.03.2009 | HR | 31.03.2009 | MK | 31.03.2009 | RS | 31.03.2009 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON 2-6-(3-AMIN-PIPERIDIN-1-YL)-3-METHYL-2,4-DIOXO-3,4-DIHYDRO-2H-PYRIMIDIN-1-YLMETHYL-4-FLUOR-BENZONITRIL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DIABETES, KREBS, AUTOIMMUNERKRANKUNGEN UND HIV-INFEKTIONEN | [2011/07] | English: | USE OF 2-6-(3-AMINO-PIPERIDIN-1-YL)-3-METHYL-2,4-DIOXO-3,4-DIHYDRO-2H-PYRIMIDIN-1-YLMETHYL-4-FLUORO-BENZONITRILE FOR TREATING DIABETES, CANCER, AUTOIMMUNE DISORDERS AND HIV INFECTION | [2011/07] | French: | ADMINISTRATION DU 2-6-(3-AMINO-PIPERIDIN-1-YL)-3-METHYL-2,4-DIOXO-3,4-DIHYDRO-2H-PYRIMIDIN-1-YLMETHYL-4-FLUORO-BENZONITRILE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU DIABÈTE, DU CANCER, DES TROUBLES AUTO-IMMUNITAIRES ET DE L'INFECTION PAR LE VIH | [2011/06] |
Former [2009/27] | VERWENDUNG EINER 2-6-(3-AMIN-PIPERIDIN-1-YL)-3-METHYL-2,4-DIOXO-3,4-DIHYDRO-2H-PYRIMIDIN-1-YLMETHYL-4-FLUOR-BENZONITRIL-VERBINDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DIABETES, KREBS, AUTOIMMUNERKRANKUNGEN UND HIV-INFEKTIONEN | ||
Former [2009/27] | USE OF 2-6-(3-AMINO-PIPERIDIN-1-YL)-3-METHYL-2,4-DIOXO-3,4-DIHYDRO-2H-PYRIMIDIN-1-YLMETHYL-4-FLUORO-BENZONITRILE COMPOUND FOR TREATING DIABETES, CANCER, AUTOIMMUNE DISORDERS AND HIV INFECTION | ||
Former [2009/27] | ADMINISTRATION D'INHIBITEURS DE LA DIPEPTIDYL PEPTIDASE | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 27.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.11.2010 | 03.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/08] |
Former [2013/33] | IS | 31.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1586571 (TAKEDA SAN DIEGO INC [US]) [X] 1-32 * paragraphs [0279] , [0287] , [0347]; claims 95,140-142,144; compound 30 *; | [PX]WO2007033350 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al) [PX] 1-29 * paragraphs [0018] , [0086] - [0088]; claims 20,44,46,47 * * abstract *; | [PX]WO2007033265 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al) [PX] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2007033266 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al) [PX] 1-29* the whole document * |