Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |
31.01.2012 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.12.2011 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.04.2011 | Supplementary search report | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] |
25.02.2011 | Change - extension states | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] |
22.12.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.08.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] |
27.08.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] |
24.08.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.07.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.07.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.07.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.11.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.07.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.07.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.03.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication |