Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009082290 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007SE01165 | 21.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011184372 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007SE01165 | 21.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2231094 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2011 | A4 | EP2231094 | 29.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007SE01165 | 21.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0722309 | 22.04.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007SE01165 | 21.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101902999 | 01.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007SE01165 | 21.12.2007 |