EP2231094 - ABSORBENT GARMENT PROVIDED WITH SIDE PANELS OR BELT MEMBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states Sca Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESPING ÖSTLIN, Hanna Vällsjövägen 29 S-435 43 Pixbo / SE | 02 /
KARLSSON, Birgitta Törnrosvägen 14 S-435 31 Mölnlycke / SE | 03 /
WRELAND, John Fällhagen 12 S-561 48 Huskvarna / SE | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | VALEA AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 07852157.2 | 21.12.2007 | [2010/39] | WO2007SE01165 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009082290 | Date: | 02.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2231094 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/49, A61F13/56, A61F13/62, A61F13/64 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
A61F13/49014 (EP,US);
A61F13/49012 (EP,US);
A61F13/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | SAUGFÄHIGES KLEIDUNGSSTÜCK MIT SEITENTEILEN ODER GURTELEMENTEN | [2010/39] | English: | ABSORBENT GARMENT PROVIDED WITH SIDE PANELS OR BELT MEMBERS | [2010/39] | French: | VÊTEMENT ABSORBANT POURVU DE PANS LATÉRAUX OU D'ÉLÉMENTS DE CEINTURE | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 01.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/18] | 07.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003194936 (JACKSON BYRON M [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]WO0170159 (SCA HYGIENE PROD AB [SE]) [A] 1-18 * page 19, lines 10-22; figures 11,12 *; | [A]US2007016155 (CHANG KUO-SHU E [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [E]WO2007149017 (SCA HYGIENE PROD AB [SE], et al) [E] 1-18 * figure - *; | [A]US2003109843 (GIBBS BERNADETTE M [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * | International search | [X]DE102005048868 (HARTMANN PAUL AG [DE]); | [A]WO9621412 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al); | [A]EP0641552 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [A]EP1350493 (SCA HYGIENE PROD AB [SE]); | [A]EP1354576 (DAIO SEISHI KK [JP]); | [A]FR2888490 (RGO C SARL [FR]); | [A]JP2005287871 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 75, Database accession no. 2005-729109, XP003025137 & JP2005287871 A 20051020 (DAIO SEISHI KK) |