EP2087171 - CELLULOSIC PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [2009/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLHAGE, Fredrik Hestra Ringväg 22A 504 70 Borås / SE | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2009/33] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 07852194.5 | 29.11.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007SE50922 | Priority number, date | EP20060125240 | 01.12.2006 Original published format: EP 06125240 | US20060872346P | 01.12.2006 Original published format: US 872346 P | EP20070108545 | 21.05.2007 Original published format: EP 07108545 | US20070931125P | 21.05.2007 Original published format: US 931125 P | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008066488 | Date: | 05.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2087171 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2087171 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D21H21/54, D21H17/37, D21H27/10, D21H27/30, D21H17/45, D21H17/42 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
D21H21/54 (EP,US);
B32B27/10 (EP,US);
B32B27/30 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B32B29/00 (EP,US);
D21H17/375 (EP,US);
D21H17/42 (EP,US);
D21H17/455 (EP,US);
D21H27/10 (EP,US);
D21H27/30 (EP,US);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Title | German: | CELLULOSEHALTIGES PRODUKT | [2009/33] | English: | CELLULOSIC PRODUCT | [2009/33] | French: | PRODUIT CELLULOSIQUE | [2009/33] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 16.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.09.2011 | DK | 07.09.2011 | EE | 07.09.2011 | HU | 07.09.2011 | LT | 07.09.2011 | LV | 07.09.2011 | MT | 07.09.2011 | RO | 07.09.2011 | TR | 07.09.2011 | IE | 29.11.2011 | LU | 29.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | BG | 07.12.2011 | GR | 08.12.2011 | IS | 07.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
TR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 29.11.2011 | ||
LU | 29.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 29.11.2011 | ||
LU | 29.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 29.11.2011 | ||
LU | 29.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 29.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 29.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/29] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2006068573 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [AD] 1-18 * page 7, line 25 - page 9, line 4 *; | [DA]WO2004113613 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-18 * page 2, line 11 - page 4, line 6 *; | [AD]US2003152724 (SWOBODA DEAN P [US], et al) [AD] 1-18 * example 5 *; | [A]EP0102335 (KEMA NORD AB [SE]) [A] * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 1 * * page 5, lines 18-31 * * example . * |