EP2102735 - DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE LOCATION COORDINATES OF A PRESSURE POINT WITHIN A SENSOR FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universitat Linz Altenberger Strasse 69 4040 Linz / AT | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Siegfried Siedlerstrasse 5 4040 Linz / AT | 02 /
SCHWÖDIAUER, Reinhard Wischerstrasse 13 4040 Linz / AT | [2009/45] |
Former [2009/39] | 01 /
BAUER, Siegfried Siedlerstrasse 5 4040 Linz / AT | ||
02 /
SCHWÖDIAUER, Reinhard Leibnizstrasse 14 4020 Linz / AT | Representative(s) | Hübscher & Partner Patentanwälte GmbH Spittelwiese 4 4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/46] | Patentanwaltzkanzlei Hübscher Spittelwiese 4 4020 Linz / AT | ||
Former [2009/39] | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 07855362.5 | 19.12.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007AT00576 | Priority number, date | AT20060002090 | 19.12.2006 Original published format: AT 20902006 | [2009/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008074046 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2102735 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/045 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
G06F3/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERFASSEN DER ORTSKOORDINATEN EINES DRUCKPUNKTES INNERHALB EINES SENSORFELDES | [2009/39] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE LOCATION COORDINATES OF A PRESSURE POINT WITHIN A SENSOR FIELD | [2009/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR DÉTECTER LES COORDONNÉES DE LOCALISATION D'UN POINT DE PRESSION À L'INTÉRIEUR D'UN CHAMP DE DÉTECTION | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 09.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 24.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/17] | 02.12.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004263483 (AUFDERHEIDE BRIAN E [US]) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0021] - [0057]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]WO2004053909 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; JOHNSON MARK T [NL]; DE BOER DIRK) [A] 1-3 * page 1, line 20 - page 3, line 8; figure 1 * | [Y] - BAUER S ET AL, "Ferroelectrets: Polymer-foam space-charge electrets with ferroelectric-like behaviour", ELECTRETS, 2005. ISE-12. 2005 12TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SALVADOR, BAHIA, BRAZIL 11-14 SEPT. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050911), ISBN 0-7803-9116-0, pages 23 - 27, XP010905118 [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISE.2005.1612309 |