Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8297003 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2012 | B2 | US2010015388 | 21.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007AT00578 | 20.12.2007 | AT21312006 | 22.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007336687B | Global Dossier | 22.08.2013 | B2 | AU2007336687 | 03.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007AT00578 | 20.12.2007 | AT21312006 | 22.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2094913 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2013 | B1 | EP2094913 | 02.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007AT00578 | 20.12.2007 | AT21312006 | 22.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101611197B | 23.05.2012 | B | CN101611197 | 23.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007AT00578 | 20.12.2007 | AT21312006 | 22.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008077167 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT21312006 | 22.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT504483B | 15.06.2008 | B1 | AT504483 | 15.06.2008 | A4 | Priority number | Date | AT21312006 | 22.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2450097 | 10.05.2012 | C2 | RU2009128210 | 27.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | AT21312006 | 22.12.2006 |