EP2094913 - GLIDING BED FOR CONCRETE SLABS, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A CONCRETE SLAB, AND STRUCTURE WITH A GLIDING BED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität Wien Karlsplatz 13 1040 Wien / AT | [2009/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOLLEGGER, Johann Mühlengasse 23 3400 Klosterneuburg / AT | 02 /
SCHWEIGHOFER, Anton Fockygasse 2/11 1120 Wien / AT | [2009/36] | Representative(s) | Margotti, Herwig Franz, et al Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [2013/08] |
Former [2009/36] | Margotti, Herwig Franz, et al Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 07855363.3 | 20.12.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007AT00578 | Priority number, date | AT20060002131 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: AT 21312006 | [2009/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008077167 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2094913 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2094913 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E01C7/14 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
E01C7/145 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Title | German: | GLEITLAGERUNG FÜR BETONPLATTEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER BETONPLATTE UND BAUWERK MIT EINER GLEITLAGERUNG | [2009/36] | English: | GLIDING BED FOR CONCRETE SLABS, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A CONCRETE SLAB, AND STRUCTURE WITH A GLIDING BED | [2009/36] | French: | PALIER LISSE POUR PLAQUES EN BÉTON, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PLAQUE EN BÉTON ET CONSTRUCTION PRÉSENTANT UN PALIER LISSE | [2012/31] |
Former [2009/36] | PALIER LISSE POUR PLAQUES EN BÉTON, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PLAQUE EN BÉTON ET CONSTRUCTION PRÉSENTANT UNE PLAQUE EN BÉTON | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 16.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2007 | CY | 20.02.2013 | CZ | 20.02.2013 | DK | 20.02.2013 | EE | 20.02.2013 | FI | 20.02.2013 | IT | 20.02.2013 | LT | 20.02.2013 | LV | 20.02.2013 | MC | 20.02.2013 | MT | 20.02.2013 | NL | 20.02.2013 | PL | 20.02.2013 | RO | 20.02.2013 | SE | 20.02.2013 | SI | 20.02.2013 | SK | 20.02.2013 | TR | 20.02.2013 | BG | 20.05.2013 | GR | 21.05.2013 | ES | 31.05.2013 | IS | 20.06.2013 | PT | 20.06.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 20.12.2007 | |
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 20.02.2013 | |
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | DK | 20.02.2013 | |
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | FI | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE1153788 (BRITISH CELLOPHANE LTD) [DA] 1,12,16,25 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1534351 (ORTH PETER) [A] 12,16,25 * page 7, lines 10-23; figure . *; | [A]AT286575B (MEYER KARL DR [DE]) [A] 1,25 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1087069 (BITSCHNAU LOTHAR ING [AT]) [A] 12,16* paragraphs [0007] , [0008]; figure 2 * |