Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1950995
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
20.07.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
13.07.2012 |
Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.06.2012 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.03.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.12.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.08.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.08.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.08.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.02.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.07.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.05.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2009 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] |
26.12.2008 |
First examination report |
|
22.12.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.06.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
27.06.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
06.05.2008 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.05.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|