Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8521216 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2013 | B2 | US2009073946 | 19.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003399451 | 28.11.2003 | JP2003152685 | 29.05.2003 | US85360404 | 25.05.2004 | US23638008 | 23.09.2008 | JP2003356499 | 16.10.2003 | US86313607 | 27.09.2007 | JP2003187111 | 30.06.2003 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008103685 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003399451 | 28.11.2003 | JP2003152685 | 29.05.2003 | US85360404 | 25.05.2004 | US86315507 | 27.09.2007 | JP2003356499 | 16.10.2003 | JP2003187111 | 30.06.2003 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8682294 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2014 | B2 | US2008102796 | 01.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003399451 | 28.11.2003 | JP2003152685 | 29.05.2003 | US85360404 | 25.05.2004 | JP2003356499 | 16.10.2003 | JP2003187111 | 30.06.2003 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | US86314607 | 27.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8639283 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2014 | B2 | US2008043692 | 21.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003399451 | 28.11.2003 | JP2003152685 | 29.05.2003 | US85360404 | 25.05.2004 | JP2003356499 | 16.10.2003 | US86313607 | 27.09.2007 | JP2003187111 | 30.06.2003 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007179573 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007083052 | 27.03.2007 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | JP2007083053 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4606431B | Global Dossier | 05.01.2011 | B2 | JP2007172666 | 05.07.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007083052 | 27.03.2007 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | JP2007083053 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4588346B | Global Dossier | 01.12.2010 | B2 | JP2005292995 | 20.10.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007083052 | 27.03.2007 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | JP2007083053 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4275515B | Global Dossier | 10.06.2009 | B2 | JP2005167305 | 23.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003399451 | 28.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4307211B | Global Dossier | 05.08.2009 | B2 | JP2005123880 | 12.05.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003356499 | 16.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4152817B | Global Dossier | 17.09.2008 | B2 | JP2005026763 | 27.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003187111 | 30.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4566524B | Global Dossier | 20.10.2010 | B2 | JP2004356990 | 16.12.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003152685 | 29.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1947894 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2012 | B1 | EP1947894 | 08.04.2009 | A3 | EP1947894 | 23.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2003399451 | 28.11.2003 | JP2003152685 | 29.05.2003 | JP2003356499 | 16.10.2003 | EP04012392 | 26.05.2004 | JP2003187111 | 30.06.2003 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1947893 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003399451 | 28.11.2003 | JP2003152685 | 29.05.2003 | JP2003356499 | 16.10.2003 | EP04012392 | 26.05.2004 | JP2003187111 | 30.06.2003 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1947892 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003399451 | 28.11.2003 | JP2003152685 | 29.05.2003 | JP2003356499 | 16.10.2003 | EP04012392 | 26.05.2004 | JP2003187111 | 30.06.2003 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1950995 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003399451 | 28.11.2003 | JP2003152685 | 29.05.2003 | JP2003356499 | 16.10.2003 | EP04012392 | 26.05.2004 | JP2003187111 | 30.06.2003 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8903385 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2014 | B2 | US2004259545 | 23.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003399451 | 28.11.2003 | JP2003152685 | 29.05.2003 | JP2003356499 | 16.10.2003 | JP2003187111 | 30.06.2003 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20060096188 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003399451 | 28.11.2003 | JP2003152685 | 29.05.2003 | JP2003356499 | 16.10.2003 | JP2003187111 | 30.06.2003 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20060093311 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003399451 | 28.11.2003 | JP2003152685 | 29.05.2003 | JP2003356499 | 16.10.2003 | JP2003187111 | 30.06.2003 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100769741B | Global Dossier | 23.10.2007 | B1 | KR20040103321 | 08.12.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003399451 | 28.11.2003 | JP2003152685 | 29.05.2003 | JP2003356499 | 16.10.2003 | JP2003187111 | 30.06.2003 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1482751 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2009 | B1 | EP1482751 | 13.04.2005 | A3 | EP1482751 | 01.12.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2003399451 | 28.11.2003 | JP2003152685 | 29.05.2003 | JP2003356499 | 16.10.2003 | JP2003187111 | 30.06.2003 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100438378C | 26.11.2008 | C | CN1574700 | 02.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003399451 | 28.11.2003 | JP2003152685 | 29.05.2003 | JP2003356499 | 16.10.2003 | JP2003187111 | 30.06.2003 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101052226B | 15.09.2010 | B | CN101052226 | 10.10.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003399451 | 28.11.2003 | JP2003152685 | 29.05.2003 | JP2003356499 | 16.10.2003 | JP2003187111 | 30.06.2003 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101815246B | 16.01.2013 | B | CN101815246 | 25.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003399451 | 28.11.2003 | JP2003152685 | 29.05.2003 | JP2003356499 | 16.10.2003 | JP2003187111 | 30.06.2003 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004023454D1 | 19.11.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003399451 | 28.11.2003 | JP2003152685 | 29.05.2003 | JP2003356499 | 16.10.2003 | JP2003187111 | 30.06.2003 | JP2004104292 | 31.03.2004 | Type | Earlier application | EP1482751 |